Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81302
Short Caption:THORNS (MARCUS) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C341769Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Habeas Corpus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/10/2020Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
06/10/2020Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (SC)20-21816
06/10/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. (SC)20-21818
07/29/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Habeas Corpus. "ORDER the petition DENIED." KP/JH/LS (SC)20-27657
08/13/2020Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petitioner's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)20-29991
09/21/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Real party in interest's answer to the petition due: 14 days. (SC)20-34568
10/01/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Real Party in Interest Notice of Appearance for John Niman. (SC)20-35942
10/01/2020Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Real Party in Interest Answer to Petition for Rehearing (SC)20-35943
01/15/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Granting Petition for Rehearing and Directing Response to Writ Petition. Real Parties in Interest's Answer due: 28 days. Petitioner shall have 14 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. (SC)21-01346
02/12/2021MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Motion Requesting Transmittal of Exhibits. (SC)21-04227
02/12/2021Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ. (SC)21-04228
02/24/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Exhibit. The clerk of the district court shall have 14 days from the date of this order to transmit to the clerk of this court the 911 calls entered into the district court record as an exhibit in case number C-19-341769, at the hearing held on December 10, 2019. (SC)21-05456
02/25/2021Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply to Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)21-05543
02/25/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed. (SC).
03/02/2021ExhibitFiled *** Exhibit (Original) *** Exhibit: 1. (SC)
03/30/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner's Notice of Appearance for Daniel R. Jenkins. (SC)21-09190
04/02/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on June 2, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC)21-09642
05/18/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)21-14262
05/25/2021MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Motion to Dismiss Petition and Vacate Oral Argument. (SC)21-15003
05/26/2021MotionFiled Petitioner's Response to Motion to Dismiss Petition and Vacate Oral Argument. (SC)21-15041
05/27/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Petition. On May 25, 2021, the real party in interest filed a motion to dismiss this petition as moot and vacate the oral argument scheduled for June 2, 2021. On May 26, 2021, petitioner filed a response in which he states he does not oppose the motion to dismiss and vacate. We grant the motion. The oral argument in this matter scheduled for June 2, 2021, is vacated, and we "ORDER the petition DISMISSED." EN BANC. (SC)21-15208
06/21/2021RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu/Rehearing. (SC)21-17697
06/21/2021Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)