Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81311
Short Caption:LAW VS. FED. NAT'L MORTG. ASS'NCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):69469, 69469-COA, 74448, 74448-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1501344Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/22/2020 / Shipman, MadelynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/12/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
06/12/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-21979
06/12/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-21982
06/15/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Keith J. Tierney. Check no. 1012. (SC)
06/15/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-22331
06/22/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Madelyn Shipman. (SC)20-22983
07/06/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC).20-24876
07/07/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Docketing Statement). (SC).20-24935
07/14/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Docketing Statement served on the Settlement Judge). (SC).20-25892
07/20/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for September 10, 2020 - time, place and manner to be decided at a later date. (SC)20-26345
09/21/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. (SC).20-34701
09/22/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Stipulation/Motion to Dismiss. Stipulation or Motion to Dismiss Due: 30 days. (SC)20-34809
10/20/2020MotionFiled Stipulation. (SC)20-38377
11/09/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties filed a stipulation requesting an additional 30 days to file their stipulation or motion to dismiss. The request is granted. Stipulation or motion to dismiss due: November 19, 2020. (SC)20-40920
11/18/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Stipulation and Status Report. (SC).20-42088
12/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The parties shall have until December 21, 2020, to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. (SC)20-44560
12/18/2020MotionFiled Stipulation and Status Report. (SC)20-45799
01/07/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The parties shall file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal within 30 days from the date of this order. The parties are cautioned that if they are unable to finalize their settlement agreement by that time, this matter will proceed to briefing. (SC)21-00442
02/08/2021MotionFiled Stipulation and Status Report. (SC)21-03677
02/17/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC)21-04714
03/01/2021Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested. (SC)21-05908
05/11/2021MotionFiled Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)21-13474
05/11/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and cause appearing, "this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. (SC)21-13551