Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81319
Short Caption:CHAVEZ, JR. VS. BENNETTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A806192Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:05/04/2021 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:05/04/2021How Submitted:After Oral Argument
Expedited

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/15/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (SC)
06/15/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-22238
06/15/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)20-22264
06/16/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Goodman Law Group. Check no. 14205.(SC)
06/17/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC)20-22583
06/19/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/22/15. To Court Reporter: Bill Nelson. (SC).20-22883
07/06/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-24731
09/22/2020Transcript RequestFiled Errata Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/17/19. To Court Reporter: Department 24. (SC)20-34763
09/22/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/28/20. To Court Reporter: Dept. 24. (SC)20-34938
10/15/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-37980
10/15/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume I. (SC)20-37981
10/15/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume II. (SC)20-37982
10/15/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume III. (SC)20-37983
10/16/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Nancy Maldonado stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/28/20. (SC)20-38152
11/10/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents' Answering Brief due: November 30, 2020. (SC).20-41029
11/30/2020BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC)20-43267
12/18/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-45921
12/21/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
12/21/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Expedite Appeal. (SC)20-46118
12/28/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Steve Shevorski, Chief Litigation Counsel, as counsel for respondents). (SC)20-46636
12/28/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Expedite Appeal. (SC)20-46640
01/04/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion to Expedite Appeal. (SC)21-00077
01/15/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Expedite. Disposition of this appeal will be expedited to the extent permitted by this court's docket. (SC)21-01396
03/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter is scheduled for oral argument on May 4, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. The argument will be videoconferenced. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection. Within 7 days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the phone number and email address of the attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. (SC)21-08732
04/02/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Kiel B. Ireland, Deputy Attorney General as counsel for Respondents). (SC)21-09588
04/19/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)21-11167
05/04/2021Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. 81319. (SC)
06/25/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." EN BANC. (SC)21-18292
07/20/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-20778
07/20/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/06/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 21, 2021. (SC)21-20778