Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81350
Short Caption:OLSON, CANNON, GORMLEY, ANGULO & STOBERSKI VS. DIST. CT. (AM. GUARANTEE AND LIAB. INS. CO.)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A753152Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/07/2021 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:04/07/2021How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/22/2020Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Joseph Garin. (SC)
06/22/2020Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)20-22981
06/22/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (SC)20-22984
06/22/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (SC)20-22987
06/22/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service for Appendices. (SC)20-22988
09/18/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Real Party in Interests' Answers due: 28 days. Petitioner shall have 14 days from service of the last-filed answer to file and serve any reply. (SC)20-34429
10/15/2020BriefFiled Real Party in Interest American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company Answer to Petition for Writ. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 10/15/2020) (SC)
10/15/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Answer to Petition. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC)20-37965
10/16/2020Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company's Brief Answering Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)20-38042
10/16/2020AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company's Appendix Supporting Brief Answering Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)20-38046
11/05/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Document. To date, real party in interest Hartford Fire Insurance Company has failed to file an answer to the petition. Answer due: 7 days. (SC)20-40384
11/10/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Real Party in Interest Notice Hartford Fire Insurance Company Does Not Intend to File an Answer. (SC)20-41089
11/17/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Petitioner's reply in support of petition for writ of mandamus due: November 17, 2020. (SC)20-41870
12/14/2020Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply to Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)20-45212
12/14/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
02/23/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter is scheduled for oral argument on April 7, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. The argument will be videoconferenced. The argument shall be limited to 40 minutes. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection. Within 7 days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the phone number and email address of the attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. (SC)21-05338
03/24/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)21-08383
04/07/2021Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc court. 81350. (SC)
06/04/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." Silver, J., with whom Parraguirre and Herndon, J.J., agree concurring in part and dissenting in part. EN BANC (SC)21-16035
06/29/2021RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)21-18618
06/29/2021Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)