Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81373
Short Caption:HOLGUIN VS. HOLGUINCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D582268Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/07/2020 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/01/2021How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/24/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
06/24/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-23468
06/24/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-23472
06/24/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Confidential Civil Cover Sheet (SEALED). (SC)
07/01/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from The Abrams Law Firm. Check no. 25072. (SC)
07/01/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).20-24439
07/07/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. (SC)20-25010
07/22/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-26820
07/28/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for August 13, 2020, at 10:00 AM. (SC)20-27498
08/19/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. The parties are encouraged to continue settlement discussions and settlement judge is available to speak with counsel should they desire. (SC).20-30643
08/24/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-31009
09/08/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/1719. To Court Reporter: Verbatim Reporting and Transcription, LLC. (SC)20-33055
10/29/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/17/29. (SC)20-39617
11/10/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Mario D. Valencia as counsel for respondent). (SC)20-41201
11/23/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief due: December 7, 2020. (SC)20-42706
12/07/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-44471
12/07/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 1. (SC)20-44472
12/07/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 2. (SC)20-44473
01/05/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File the Answering Brief (First Request). (SC)21-00226
01/05/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: February 5, 2021. (SC)21-00304
01/26/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-02354
01/26/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1. (SC)21-02365
02/17/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Reply Brief due: March 11, 2021. (SC).21-04698
03/11/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-07214
03/12/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
07/01/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. (SC)21-18921
07/23/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-21306
08/17/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-23956
08/17/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
09/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 18, 2021. (SC)21-23956