Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81381
Short Caption:HOSINO (RODNEY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):71858, 71858-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A790709, C308566Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:CadishCase Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/25/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
06/25/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-23682
06/30/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/08/20 To Court Reporter: DC Dept. 6. (SC)20-24166
06/30/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)20-24215
07/01/2020OtherJustice Elissa Cadish disqualified from participation in this matter. (SC)
07/02/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Entry and Transmission of Written Order and Suspending Briefing. District Court Order due: 30 days. The deadlines for the filing of documents are hereby suspended until further order of this court. (SC)20-24516
07/02/2020Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 07/02/20. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order. (SC)20-24621
07/06/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 120 days. (SC)20-24815
10/26/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-39134
10/26/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief - Volume 1. (SC)20-39135
10/26/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief - Volume 2. (SC)20-39137
10/26/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief - Volume 3. (SC)20-39138
10/26/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief - Volume 4. (SC)20-39139
10/26/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief - Volume 5. (SC)20-39140
10/26/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief - Volume 6. (SC)20-39141
10/26/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief - Volume 7. (SC)20-39143
10/26/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief - Volume 8. (SC)20-39144
10/26/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief - Volume 9. (SC)20-39145
10/26/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief - Volume 10. (SC)20-39146
10/26/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief - Volume 11. (SC)20-39147
10/26/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief - Volume 12. (SC)20-39148
10/26/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief - Volume 13. (SC)20-39149
11/25/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (John T. Niman, Deputy District Attorney as counsel for respondent). (SC)20-42984
11/25/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-42985
11/25/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Volume 1. (SC)20-42988
12/02/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-43645
12/02/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
05/17/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. (Christopher Oram as counsel for Appellant) (SC)Y21-14229