Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81392
Short Caption:SIERRA PACIFIC POWER CO. VS. DIST. CT. (COUNTRY MUTUAL INS. CO.)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1901909, CV1902265Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/26/2020Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Howard J. Russell. (SC)
06/26/2020Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)Y20-23864
06/26/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ Volume 1. (REJECTED VOLUMES OF APPENDICES NOT FILED SEPARATELY) (SC)
06/26/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC)20-23878
06/29/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ Volume 1. (SC)20-23919
06/29/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ Volume 2. (SC)20-23922
06/29/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ Volume 3. (SC)20-23923
06/29/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ Volume 4. (SC)20-23924
09/14/2020MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal Stipulation for Dismissal of Real Party in Interest D. Pennington. (SC)20-33702
09/18/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Stipulation for Dismissal and Directing Answer. On September 14, petitioner and real party in interest Donald J. Pennington filed a stipulation seeking to dismiss the petition as to Pennington only. We grant that motion, with each party to pay their own fees and costs. As a result, we direct the clerk of the court to amend the caption on the docket to conform to the caption on this order. Real party in interest Country Mutual Insurance Company, on behalf of respondents, shall have 28 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. Petitioner shall have 14 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. (SC)20-34434
10/05/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Real party in interest's answer to writ petition due: November 2, 2020. (SC)20-36499
10/27/2020MotionFiled Stipulation Extend Time to File Answering Brief to Writ Petition. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 10/27/2020) (SC)20-39333
10/27/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Of Rejection - No Notice Of Appearance for R. Samuel Ehlers. (SC)20-39344
11/03/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Real Party in Interest (Country Mutual Insurance Company) Notice of Appearance for R. Samuel Ehlers. (SC)20-40082
11/03/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief to Writ Petition. (SC)20-40087
11/05/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Real party in interest's answer due: December 2, 2020. Petitioner shall have until January 8, 2021, to file and serve a reply in support of the petition if deemed necessary. (SC)20-40410
12/02/2020Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest Answer to Petition for Writ. (SC)20-43703
01/08/2021BriefFiled Petitioner's Reply in Support of Its Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)21-00610
03/12/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner's Notice of Settlement. (SC)21-07233
03/16/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Petitioner has filed a notice informing this court that the parties have reached a settlement. Petitioner shall have 45 days from the date of this order to file either a motion or stipulation to dismiss the petition. (SC)21-07546
04/12/2021MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. (SC)21-10450
04/13/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Petition. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and cause appearing, "this petition is dismissed." Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued (SC)21-10649