Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81400
Short Caption:ROBERTSON (RAEKWON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):76954, 78442, 81374, 81374-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C328587Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/30/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
06/30/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-24126
07/01/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (SC)20-24394
07/01/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings (REJECTED PER 7/1/20 NOTICE). (SC)
07/01/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC)20-24441
07/02/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/11/20, 2/12/20, 2/13/20, 2/14/20, 2/18/20, 2/19/20, 2/20/20, 2/24/20, 6/5/20, and 6/11/20. To Court Reporter: Sarah Richardson. (SC)20-24538
08/11/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sara Richardson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/11/20, 2/12/20, 2/13/20, 2/14/20, 2/18/20, 2/19/20, 2/20/20, 2/24/20, 06/11/20. (SC).20-29641
10/21/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 12, 2020. (SC).20-38633
11/12/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1-7. (SC)20-41426
11/12/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-41429
11/12/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Corrected Opening Brief. (SC)20-41430
12/09/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-44750
01/25/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening/No Reply Brief Filed. (SC)
04/29/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Notice of Voluntary Disclosure. I (Justice Douglas Herndon) have no bias or prejudices as to any of the parties or issues in the litigation and do not believe that my impartiality could reasonably be questioned. However, I make this disclosure so that any person who wishes to request my disqualification may do so by filing a motion pursuant to NRAP 35. Any recusal request should be made in writing within seven (7) days of the filing date of this Voluntary Disclosure.21-12350
05/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-13945
06/08/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-16344
06/08/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 9, 2021. (SC)21-16344