Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81411
Short Caption:POPE VS. FELLHAUERCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):68673, 74428
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A714378Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:En Banc Reconsider Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:07/08/2020 / Kunin, IsraelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/30/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
06/30/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-24251
06/30/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-24253
07/07/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Avalon Legal Group. Check no. 001313. (SC)
07/07/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).20-25034
07/08/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (SC)20-25248
07/24/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for September 14, 2020, at 9:30 AM. (SC)20-27052
07/28/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-27494
09/14/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)20-33756
09/16/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-34084
09/30/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Transcript Request Form due: October 14, 2020. (SC)20-35828
10/14/2020Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript Is Being Requested. (SC)20-37755
10/20/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Expedite Appeal. (SC)20-38414
10/22/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Expedite Appeal. (SC)20-38826
10/28/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondents' opposed motion to expedite this appeal is granted to the following extent. The resolution of this appeal shall be expedited to the extent this court's calendar will permit. (SC)20-39411
12/09/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: December 29, 2020. (SC)20-44749
12/29/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant Trevor Pope's Notice of Change of Address of Counsel. (SC)20-46882
12/29/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume I (part 1 of 4). (SC)20-46883
12/29/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume II. (SC)20-46884
12/29/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume III. (SC)20-46885
12/29/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume IV. (SC)20-46886
12/29/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-46887
01/28/2021BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 01/29/21). (SC)
01/28/2021AppendixFiled Respondents' Appendix - Volume 1. (SC)21-02730
01/29/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days.21-02761
02/01/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-03098
02/12/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant shall have until March 17, 2021, to file and serve the reply brief. (SC)21-04276
03/15/2021MotionFiled Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Appellant's Reply Brief (Appellant's Second Request). (SC)21-07471
03/16/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's reply brief due: March 24, 2021. (SC)21-07562
03/24/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-08480
03/25/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
07/09/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn7[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] JH/RP/MG (SC)21-19785
07/23/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: August 10, 2021. (SC)21-21333
08/10/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-23291
08/10/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Attorney Bryan Naddafi. (SC)
08/20/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC)21-24302
09/01/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's petition for en banc reconsideration due: September 17, 2021. (SC)21-25497
09/17/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)Y21-27072