Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81413
Short Caption:REIMANN VS. OVATION FIN. HOLDINGS, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A806588Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/20/2020 / Kuzemka, KristineSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/01/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
07/01/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-24375
07/01/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-24377
07/01/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-24379
07/13/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (SC)20-25637
07/14/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Ayon Law. Check no. 1557. (SC)
07/14/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-25874
07/20/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kristine M. Kuzemka. (SC)20-26372
08/06/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-29013
08/10/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record (Luis A. Ayon and Steven H. Burke as counsel for Appellants). (SC)20-29320
09/03/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall remove attorneys Luis A. Ayon, Esq. and Steven H. Burke, Esq., of the law firm of Ayon Law, PLLC, from the docket of this appeal. Appellants JRK Global, Inc. and Katalin Reimann, shall have 30 days from the date of this order to retain new counsel and cause new counsel to file a notice of appearance with this court. The timelines for further settlement proceedings are stayed pending further order of this court. (SC)20-32613
10/23/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. It appears that Katalin Reimann will be proceeding in pro se on appeal. Because it does not appear that Ms. Reimann is an attorney, she may not represent JRK Global, Inc., on appeal. JRK Global, Inc., shall have 21 days from the date of this order to retain counsel on appeal and cause counsel to file a notice of appearance with this court. (SC)20-38932
12/04/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Dismissing Appellant JRK Global, INC., Removing Appeal from Settlement Program and Reinstating Briefing. To date, JRK Global, INC., has not responded to this court's order. Accordingly, JRK Global, Inc.'s appeal is dismissed. The clerk of this court shall amend the cation accordingly. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. The clerk of this court shall provide appellant with the instructions and an informal brief form for pro se parties, a blank docketing statement and a blank transcript request form. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 21 days docketing statement; 120 days opening brief. (SC)20-43990
12/04/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)20-43994
12/08/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Disassociation of Counsel. (SC)20-44581
02/03/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Documents. Appellant's Transcript Request Form and Docketing Statement due: 14 days. (SC)21-03341
04/08/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-10113
05/03/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-12529
05/03/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
05/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 4, 2021. (SC)21-12529