Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81414
Short Caption:IN RE: GUARDIANSHIP OF JONESCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):81799, 81799-COA, 82974
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - G052263Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/28/2020 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/01/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
07/01/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-24393
07/01/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-24396
07/01/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-24398
07/07/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Confidential Civil Cover Sheet (SEALED). (SC)
07/07/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Ty E. Kehoe via E-Payment. Confirmation no. 20070792410036. (SC)
07/08/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (SC)20-25072
07/16/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-26179
07/20/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (SC)20-26366
07/28/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other. The Settlement Judge requests this case be reassigned due to a potential conflict. (SC)20-27400
07/28/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. Issued Amended Notice of Assignment to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. New Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (SC)20-27447
08/06/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC20-29066
08/07/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge - Docketing Statement. (SC)20-29092
08/11/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for August 25, 2020, at 1:00 pm. (SC).20-29512
08/13/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service (Docketing Statement served on settlement Judge). (SC)20-29852
09/01/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Other. Per the Settlement Judge, the appellant is deceased. Counsel will be filing a Suggestion of Death. The Settlement Conference is vacated. (SC)20-32235
09/25/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Counsel for Rodney Gerald Yeoman shall have 90 days from the date of this order to : (1) file a motion for the substitution of a personal representative or (2) inform this court that Rodney Gerald Yeoman has no personal representative. Settlement proceedings are stayed pending receipt and review of a response to this order. (SC)20-35467
11/05/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/17/20 and 10/7/20. (SC)20-40437
12/22/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time Regarding Substitution of a Personal Representative. (SC)20-46187
12/28/2020MotionFiled Respondent Kimberly Jones' Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)20-46706
01/05/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Response to the Motion to Dismiss Appeal due: January 19, 2021. (SC).21-00183
01/19/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File a Response to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)21-01616
01/29/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. Counsel for appellant is directed to file a motion to substitute a personal representative on or before February 8, 2021. Counsel for appellant is directed to file the response to the motion to dismiss on or before February 18, 2021. (SC)21-02877
02/08/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Substitute Special Administrator of the Estate of Rodney Gerald Yeoman in Place and Stead of Appellant Rodney Gerald Yeoman and to Amend Caption. (SC)21-03795
02/09/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge for Motion. (SC)21-03822
02/12/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Proof of Service for Motion. (SC)21-04338
02/17/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Lifting Stay of Settlement Proceedings. The clerk of this court shall amend the caption and docket of this appeal by substituting Richard Powell in his capacity as special administrator of the Estate of Rodney Gerald Yeoman in place and stead of appellant Rodney Gerald Yeoman, deceased. We lift our stay of settlement proceedings and direct the settlement judge to submit an amended early case assessment report within 30 days and a final settlement status report within 90 days of the date of this order. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs remain stayed during the pendency of settlement proceedings. (SC)21-04642
02/18/2021MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to Extend Time Regarding Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)21-04894
03/04/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Staying Settlement Proceedings. On February 18, 2021, appellant filed a second motion for an extension of time to file a response to respondents' December 28, 2021, motion to dismiss appeal. The unopposed motion is granted. Appellant shall file a response to the motion to dismiss or alternatively, a motion to dismiss this appeal, within 90 days from the date of this order. The settlement proceedings shall be stayed pending further order of this court. (SC)21-06347
06/16/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On March 4, 2021, this court granted appellant an extension of time to file a response to respondents' December 28, 2020, motion to dismiss appeal, or alternatively, a motion or stipulation to dismiss this appeal, within 90 days. To date, appellant has failed to comply with this order. Accordingly, appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file their response to respondent's motion to dismiss appeal, or a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal, or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. (SC)21-17362
07/08/2021Settlement Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. The unopposed motion to dismiss appeal is granted and "this appeal is dismissed." (SC)21-19579
07/08/2021MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to Extend Time Regarding Motion to Dismiss. (SC)21-19592
07/14/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On July 8, 2021, this court granted respondent's unopposed motion to dismiss this appeal and dismissed this appeal. Later that same date, appellant filed a motion for an extension of time to file a response to the motion to dismiss. In light of the July 8, 2021, order dismissing this appeal, no action will be taken on the July 8, 2021, motion for an extension of time. (SC)21-20308
08/02/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-22274
08/02/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/20/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 3, 2021. (SC)21-22274