Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81416
Short Caption:ROSS VS. STATE, EMP'T SEC. DIV.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A802206Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/01/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC)
07/01/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)20-24470
07/01/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)20-24472
07/06/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC)20-24679
07/21/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-26563
11/05/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-40415
11/05/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. (SC)20-40416
12/07/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents' answering brief due: December 21, 2020. (SC)20-44296
12/21/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-46120
01/25/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Document. (SC)21-02229
01/25/2021OtherReturned Unfiled Reply Brief. (SC)21-02231
02/05/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed. (SC)
05/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-13964
06/08/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-16346
06/08/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 9, 2021. (SC)21-16346