Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81427
Short Caption:MCDONALD (RICKY) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 20EW000151BClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/07/2021How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/06/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
07/06/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-24852
07/16/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Attorney General to Obtain and Transmit Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal Log or Other Log Maintained by the Prison. Notice of Appeal Log due: 30 days. (SC).20-26187
08/11/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Attorney General's Response to Court Order. (SC)20-29515
08/24/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Allowing Appeal to Proceed and Directing Transmission of Record on Appeal. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. Record on Appeal due: 60 days. (SC)20-31056
08/28/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC)20-31859
09/11/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 1. (SC).20-33583
01/07/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision/To Screening. (SC)
03/05/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as moot due to appellant no longer being incarcerated. Respondent may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellant's response is served. (SC)21-06490
03/05/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Response. We direct the Attorney General to provide appropriate documentation of appellant's expired sentence. fn1 [Appropriate documentation includes NDOC records of an offender's legal orders showing release.] (SC)21-06499
03/24/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Order. (SC)21-08466
05/07/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." JH/RP/EC (SC)21-13170
06/01/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-15569
06/01/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 4, 2021. (SC)21-15569