Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 81432
Short Caption:FRANKLIN VS. LAUGHLINCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):67364, 70304
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A815083Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Denied
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/07/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
07/07/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-25036
07/07/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-25038
07/14/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Bobby Franklin. Check no. 172. (SC)
07/15/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)20-25964
07/27/2020Transcript RequestFiled Civil Proper Person Appellant's Transcript Request Form. (SC)20-27229
07/27/2020Docketing StatementFiled Proper Person Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeal. (SC)20-27230
07/30/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." NNP20-RP/JH/EC (SC)20-27785
08/18/2020OtherReturned Unfiled Document (Appellant's Petition for Rehearing)(SC)20-30481
08/18/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Dissolve any Injunctions on the 80 Acres until this Appeal is Resolved. (SC)20-30486
08/24/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Rehearing. (SC)20-31178
09/03/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Motions. Appellant has filed an untimely motion requesting an extension of time to file a petition for rehearing. The motion is granted. NRAP 26(b)(1)(A); NRAP 40(a)(1). The clerk shall file the petition for rehearing received on August 31, 2020. Appellant's motion asking this court to dissolve injunctions on the 80 acres of land allegedly in dispute until the appeal is resolved is denied. (SC)20-32526
09/03/2020Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Persons Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)20-32537
09/03/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid (Rehearing). $150.00 from Bobby Franklin Check No. 177. (SC)
09/03/2020Filing FeeReturned Filing Fee (Rehearing). Check No. 178 returned to Bobby Franklin. (SC)
09/16/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Errata for Petition for Rehearing (SC)20-34100
10/01/2020Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC).20-36022