Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81218-COA
Short Caption:SHAHROKHI VS. DIST. CT. (BURROW)Court:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):78771, 78771-COA, 79336, 79336-COA, 79992, 79992-COA, 80277, 80277-COA, 80447, 80447-COA, 81218, 81791, 81791-COA, 81978, 81978-COA, 82245, 82803, 83164, 83558, 83662, 83682
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D581208Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:GibbonsCase Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Senior Justice None for Judge GibbonsPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/13/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
07/13/2020Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (Action Necessary by May 29, 2020) (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 07/13/20 ORDER). (COA).20-25593
07/13/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Emergency Motion Seeking an Order to Show Cause and Why Matthew P. Harter, District Judge, Should not be held in Contempt of Court not Following Directives Served on Him in Court of Appeals Writ #79336. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 07/13/20 ORDER). (COA).20-25595
07/13/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Seal Appendix attached to Original Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (TRANFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 07/13/20 ORDER). (COA).20-25596
07/13/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Emergency "Motion for Transmittal of Report Involving Minor Child." (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 07/13/20 ORDER). (COA).20-25597
07/13/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion Seeking to Restore Petitioner's Parental Rights Immediately in Violation of Petitioner's First Amendment Rights and Fourteenth Amendment Rights, Motion Seeking an Order to Return the Minor to State of Nevada Immediately. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 07/13/20 ORDER). (COA).20-25598
07/13/2020Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document "Statement of Face-Time Calls Observation." (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 07/13/20 ORDER). (COA).20-25599
07/13/2020Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person Letter "Affidavit of Jimmy Nguyen." (TRANSFERRED TO THE SUPREME COURT PER 07/13/20 ORDER). (COA).20-25602
07/13/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Petitioner's "Motion to Strike District Court "No Contact" Order VOID..." (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 07/13/20 ORDER). (COA).20-25605
07/13/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Petitioner's "Emergency Motion to Disqualify Mathew Harter, District Court Judge..." (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 07/13/20 ORDER). (COA).20-25606
07/13/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Request Penalties for Refusal or Neglect to Obey Writ # COA-79336, Mathew Harter, District Court, Family Judge, Pursuant to NRS 34.290. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 07/13/20 ORDER). (COA).20-25607
07/14/2020MotionFiled ORIGINAL - Declaration of Jerome Tao. (COA)20-25822
07/21/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Petitioner's Emergency Motion for Stay. (COA)20-26502
07/22/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Petitioner's Motion to Vacate Temporary Relocation Order Pursuant to NRCP 12(H)(3), Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. (COA)20-26723
07/27/2020OtherJudge Michael P. Gibbons disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Parties
07/28/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1[The Honorable Michael P. Gibbons, Chief Judge, has voluntarily recused himself from participation in this matter.] fn2[The clerk of this court shall file, under seal, the proposed appendix provisionally received in the supreme court on May 21, 2020, and transferred to this court on July 13, 2020.] fn3[In light of this order, petitioner's motions, with the exception of the motion to seal, as denied as moot.] Court of Appeals-JT/BB (COA)20-27388
07/28/2020AppendixFiled SEALED Proper Person Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. (COA)
08/24/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA).
08/24/2020Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA).