Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81473
Short Caption:EVENDEN VS. HAACKCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A753435Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/29/2020 / Jimmerson, JamesSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/16/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
07/16/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-26213
07/16/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-26215
07/25/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellants' Notice Regarding Payment of Filing Fee. (SC)20-27130
07/27/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from The Verstandig Law Firm. Check no. 1391. (SC)
07/27/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellants - due: 21 days. (SC)20-27212
07/28/2020Filing FeeReturned Filing Fee. Check No. 1382 returned to The Verstandig Law Firm. (SC)
07/29/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: James J. Jimmerson. (SC)20-27596
08/10/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement - Civil Appeals. (SC)20-29449
08/14/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for August 28, 2020, at 9:00 am. (SC).20-30172
09/02/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)20-32442
09/04/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-32676
09/13/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/18/20, 02/19/20, 02/20/20 and 02/21/20. To Court Reporter: Maria Garibay. (SC)20-33672
10/12/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to Associate Counsel (Stephen Isaiah Vladeck). (SC)20-37404
10/21/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)20-38682
10/22/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Associate Counsel. Mr. Vladeck shall be permitted to appear on behalf of appellants in this matter. (SC)20-38705
10/26/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)20-39230
11/06/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Respondents have moved to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction on the ground that the order is not final. The motion is denied. (SC).20-40719
11/20/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief on Appeal. (SC)20-42448
11/20/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix - Volume I. (SC)20-42449
11/20/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix - Volume II. (SC)20-42450
11/20/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix - Volume III. (SC)20-42451
11/20/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix - Volume IV. (SC)20-42454
12/16/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC)20-45598
12/16/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondents' Answering Brief due: January 20, 2021. (SC)20-45608
01/19/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorney (Respondents hereby substitutes Karl A. Shelton, Esq., of the Law Office of Karl A. Shelton in the above-entitled action in place of Michael C. Van, Esq., of the law firm Shumway Van). (SC)21-01623
01/20/2021BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC)21-01691
01/20/2021AppendixFiled Respondents' Appendix - Volume 1. (SC)21-01694
01/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court shall substitute Karl A. Shelton, Esq., of the Law Office of Karl A. Shelton in place of Michael C. Van, Esq., of the law firm Shumway Van as counsel for respondents. Respondents' answering brief was filed on January 20, 2021. Appellants shall have until February 19, 2021, to file and serve a reply brief, if deemed necessary. (SC)21-02381
02/15/2021BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC)21-04382
02/15/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Reply Brief. (SC)21-04383
02/16/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/16/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-11083
05/11/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-13450
05/11/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 12, 2021. (SC)21-13450