Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81474
Short Caption:CITY OF HENDERSON VS. DIST. CT. (SOLID STATE PROPS., LLC)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A788817Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/26/2021How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/16/2020Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. State/County/Municipality. (SC)
07/16/2020Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)20-26241
07/16/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ Volume 2. (SC)20-26248
07/16/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ Volume 1. (SC)20-26249
09/18/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 28 days. Petitioner shall have 14 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. (SC)20-34428
10/15/2020BriefFiled Real Party in Interest Answer to Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)20-37913
10/26/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Petitioner's reply due: November 12, 2020. (SC)20-39124
11/12/2020BriefFiled Petitioner's Reply Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)20-41428
11/12/2020BriefFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Brief to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Pursuant to NRAP 21(a). (SC)20-41434
03/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)21-08724
06/24/2021Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." Before: Parraguirre/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Stiglich/Silver. 137 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 26. SNP21-RP/LS/AS. (SC).21-18170
06/24/2021WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to Attorney Brandon P. Kemble for service upon Judge Timothy C. Williams. (SC)21-18175
07/12/2021WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Timothy C. Williams on July 6th, 2021. (SC).21-19997
07/19/2021RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)21-20659
07/19/2021Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)