Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81476
Short Caption:SHARKEY (JAMES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):73810, 73810-COA, 73858, 73858-COA, 73859, 73859-COA, 74290, 74290-COA, 74684, 74684-COA, 74740, 75474, 75474-COA, 79294, 79294-COA, 80001, 80001-COA, 81134
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C321917Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/30/2020How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/20/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
07/20/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-26407
08/11/2020Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 07/30/20. Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Court Order if Discovery; Forensic Evaluation of Newly Discovered Evidence and; New Trial Under NRS 176.515 and Defendant's Motion to Reschedule Hearing Regarding Motion for New Trial. (SC).20-29562
08/14/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)20-30113
08/21/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-11 - C321917 (via FTP). (SC).20-30920
08/27/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 1-35, 491-496, 559-560, 1661-1664, 1743-1748, 1953-1957, 2101-2102, and 2160-2166. SEALED (SC)
08/27/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 636-646. SEALED (SC)
12/30/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision/To Screening. (SC)
09/16/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn2 [The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] JH/LS/MG. (SC)21-26859