Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81484
Short Caption:NASBY (BRENDAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):35319, 47130, 58579, 67476, 67580, 67704, 68039, 70626, 70626-COA, 73412, 73412-COA, 78744, 78744-COA, 80443, 80443-COA, 81484-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A788126, C154293Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:SilverCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/10/2021How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/21/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
07/21/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-26607
08/04/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Filed Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Opening Brief or Informal Brief Due: 120 Days. (SC)20-28421
08/11/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - A788126 - VOL 1. (SC).20-29544
08/12/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-12 (Via FTP). (SC)20-29669
08/18/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Pages 1017 to 1022. (SEALED) (SC)
08/18/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Pages 22 to 26, 167 to 171, and 173. (SEALED) (SC)
08/18/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Pages 3 to 49, 53 to 55, 63 to 94, 97 to 131, 1163 to 1166, 1527 to 1530, 1769 to 1779, 1789, 1810 to 1813, 2053, 2145 to 2146, and 2521 to 2540. (SEALED) (SC)
11/30/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief due: December 16, 2020. (SC)20-43295
12/21/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice of Constitutional Challenge. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/15/21 NOTICE).20-46092
12/21/2020BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-46093
02/10/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision/To Screening. (SC)
03/15/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).21-07476
03/15/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
04/28/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC)
08/03/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
08/03/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Extension to File Petition for Review. (SC)21-22572
08/04/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a motion for as long an extension of time to file a petition for review as is possible. The motion is granted to the following extent. Petition for review due: 30 days. (SC)21-22614
09/08/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person's Petition for Review. (SC)21-25967
09/14/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Errata for Petition for Review. (SC)21-26492
09/14/2021OtherJustice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal
09/22/2021Post-Judgment Order/DispositionalOrder Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied." fn1 [The Honorable Abbie Silver, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC. (SC)21-27348
09/22/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-27385
09/22/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)