Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81524
Short Caption:IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO D. J. C. AND J.A.C., JR.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - DR-DR-19-268Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:
Expedited

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/27/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Hillewaert Law Firm. Check no. 5258. (SC)
07/27/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Parental Termination/Counsel. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (SEALED) (SC)
07/27/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines/Parental Termination with Counsel. (SC)
07/28/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 5/14/20. To Court Reporter: None Listed. (SC)
07/29/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service (Appellant's Transcript Request). Due date: 10 days. (SC)
07/29/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service- Certificate of Service for Appellant's Transcript Request. (SC)
08/17/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)
09/16/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lisa M. Manley stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/14/2020
10/26/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: November 9, 2020. (SC)
11/09/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 11/10/2020) (SC)
11/10/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC)
11/17/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief (REJECTED PER 11/17/20 NOTICE). (SC).
11/17/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume I (REJECTED PER 11/17/20 NOTICE). (SC).
11/17/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document (Opening Brief and Appendix). (SC).
11/30/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time Motion to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)
12/02/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have 7 days from the state of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)
12/03/2020BriefFiled Appellants Opening Brief. (SC)
12/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 12/3/20) (SC)
12/03/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC)
12/07/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Amended Opening Brief. (SC)
12/07/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1 (SC)
12/23/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 12/24/2020). (SC)
12/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. (SC)
12/24/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Answering Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC)
12/28/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)
01/19/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)
01/22/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/16/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP21-EC/KP/DH (SC)21-11121
05/11/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-13451
05/11/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 17, 2021. (SC)21-13451