Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81525
Short Caption:ROYER (GARY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR170173Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/27/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
07/27/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-27321
08/04/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Temporary Remand. Order of Limited Remand for Designation of Counsel. District Court Order Appointing Counsel Due: 35 days. (SC)20-28407
08/13/2020Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on August 13, 2020. This matter is referred to Krista Meier, Esq., Administrator of the Court Appointed Counsel, for the selection of counsel for Defendant/Petitioner Gary W. Royer. (SC)20-29973
08/20/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk the State of State of Nevada vs. Gary W. Royer/ Notice of Appearance of Counsel. (Thomas Lloyd Qualls) (SC)20-30737
08/25/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Setting Briefing Schedule. The Clerk of this court shall add Mr. Qualls as counsel of record for appellant in this appeal. Transcript request and docketing statement due: 21 days. Opening brief and appendix due: 120 days. (SC)20-31245
09/03/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)20-32605
09/07/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts Requested: 6/11/20. To Court Reporter: Debora Cecere. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 9/8/20). (SC)
09/07/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/15/17. To Court Reporter: Constance Eisenberg. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 9/8/20). (SC)
09/07/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/5/17. To Court Reporter: Corrie Wolden. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 9/8/20). (SC)
09/08/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection - 3 Deficient Transcript Request Forms. (SC)20-32892
09/08/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/11/20, 2/15/17, 4/5/17. To Court Reporter: Debora Cecere, Constance Eisenberg, Corrie Wolden. (SC)20-32932
10/07/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Constance S. Eisenberg stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/17/17. (SC)20-36818
10/07/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Debora L. Cecere stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 06/11/20. (SC)20-36819
10/26/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Corrie L. Wolden stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/05/17. (SC)20-39203
12/22/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-46162
12/22/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief due: January 22, 2021. (SC)20-46181
01/20/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Hold Appeal in Abeyance Pending Resolution to Habeas Petition Challenging Credit for Time Served. (SC)21-01689
01/21/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Marilee Cate, Deputy District Attorney as counsel for respondent). (SC)21-01879
01/21/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Opposition to Motion to Hold Appeal in Abeyance Pending Resolution of Habeas Petition Challenging Credit for Time Served. (SC)21-01880
01/29/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion to hold this appeal in abeyance. The motion is denied without prejudice to appellant's right to file a motion for limited remand pursuant to the procedures outlined in NRAP 12A. (SC)21-02817
02/05/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief Pursuant to NRAP 26(b)(1)(A). (SC)21-03593
02/12/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until March 23, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)21-04245
03/23/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)21-08355
03/23/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol I. (SC)21-08356
03/31/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Due to Employment with State of Nevada. (SC)21-09383
04/07/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Withdraw and Remanding to Secure Appellate Counsel. The clerk of this court shall remove Thomas Qualls as counsel of record for appellant. District Court Order Appointing Counsel due: 35 days. Briefing is suspended. (SC)21-09964
04/15/2021Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on April 14, 2021. This matter is referred to Krista Meier, Esq., Administrator of the Court Appointed Counsel, for the selection of counsel for Appellant. (SC)21-10874
04/19/2021Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order Appointing Counsel. (Corrected). (SC)21-11184
04/30/2021Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order Appointing Counsel. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on April 28, 2021 appointing Vicky T. Oldenburg as counsel for appellant. (SC)21-12442
05/04/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court shall add Ms. Oldenburg as counsel for appellant in this appeal. Ms. Oldenburg shall have 7 days from the date of this order to inform this court in writing whether she intends to proceed with the opening brief on file or intends to file a supplemental opening brief. (SC)21-12778
05/08/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Intent to Proceed with Opening Brief on File. (SC)21-13227
05/12/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. In response to this court's May 4, 2021, order, counsel for appellant informs this court that she intends to proceed with the opening brief on file in this matter. Accordingly, the briefing schedule is reinstated as follows. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)21-13583
06/10/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Marilee Cate, Appellate Deputy as counsel for Respondent). (SC)21-16766
06/10/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). (SC)21-16767
06/15/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: July 12, 2021. (SC)21-17215
07/09/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Voluntary Withdrawal of Appeal. (SC)21-19700
07/13/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Voluntary Dismissal.Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Having been so informed, appellant consents to a voluntary dismissal of this appeal. This court "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-20132