Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81532
Short Caption:KK REAL ESTATE INV. FUND, LLC VS. CAPITAL ONE, N.A.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):64185, 75530, 75530-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A682482Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:08/13/2020 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/28/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
07/28/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-27436
07/28/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-27438
07/28/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-27440
08/04/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from The Wright Law Group. Check no. 3661. (SC)
08/05/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-28616
08/12/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Appellants to File Overdue Case Appeal Statement. Due: 7 days. (SC)20-29716
08/12/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (SC).20-29740
08/13/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. (SC).20-29965
08/26/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement (SC)20-31512
08/26/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for September 8, 2020, at 1:30 PM. (SC)20-31529
08/27/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. (SC)20-31584
09/14/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)20-33757
09/16/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-34085
09/25/2020Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)20-35338
12/15/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-45442
12/15/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 1. (SC)20-45443
12/15/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 2. (SC)20-45444
12/15/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 3. (SC)20-45445
12/15/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 4. (SC)20-45446
01/13/2021MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Answering Brief. (SC)21-01111
01/13/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Answering Brief. Due date February 16, 2021. (SC)21-01119
02/16/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-04548
03/17/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-07754
03/17/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
05/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-13976
05/27/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's petition for rehearing due: June 15, 2021. (SC)21-15197
06/15/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-17299
06/15/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from John Henry Wright. (SC)
06/28/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-18514
07/09/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)21-19788
07/20/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC. (SC)21-20819
08/16/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-23798
08/16/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
09/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 17, 2021. (SC)21-23798