Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81537
Short Caption:WORLD CLASS, LLC VS. DRUCKERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A804593Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/13/2020 / Haberfeld, StephenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/28/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
07/28/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-27520
07/28/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-27522
07/28/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-27524
07/30/2020Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Jonathan R. Patterson. (SC)
07/30/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellants - due: 21 days. (SC)20-27766
08/12/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Appellants to File Overdue Case Appeal Statement. Due: 7 days. (SC)20-29715
08/12/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (SC)20-29726
08/13/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. (SC)20-29858
08/13/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. (SC).20-29954
08/26/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-31434
09/08/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (SC)20-33112
09/09/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service - Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-33166
09/16/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Docketing Statement). (SC)20-34139
10/02/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. (SC).20-36353
10/05/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Amended Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC).20-36554
10/07/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-36744
12/09/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-44769
12/17/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/09/20, 06/11/20, 06/16/20, 08/20/20. To Court Reporter: Dept 22. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 12/17/20). (SC)
12/17/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request.20-45727
12/17/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/09/20, 06/11/20, 0616/20 and 08/2020. To Court Reporter: Department 22. (SC)20-45743
02/08/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 14 days. (SC)21-03703
02/22/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)21-05238
02/22/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1. (SC)21-05239
03/24/2021BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 03/24/21). (SC)
03/24/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days.21-08442
03/24/2021BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC)21-08459
03/24/2021AppendixFiled Respondents' Appendix (Vol. I of I). (SC)21-08460
04/22/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants' reply brief due: May 7, 2021. (SC)21-11595
05/07/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-13197
05/07/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
07/09/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn4[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] JH/RP/MG (SC)21-19798
08/03/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-22488
08/03/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/20/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 4, 2021. (SC)21-22488