Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81540
Short Caption:IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF HAROLD GEWERTERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Discipline - Appeal
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/12/2021How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/29/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Bar Matter/Bar Discipline. (SC).
07/29/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings Vol I. (SC).20-27577
07/29/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings Vol I (Cont...). (SC).20-27579
07/29/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings Vol I (Cont...) - Vol. II. (SC).20-27580
07/29/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings Vol II (Cont...). (SC).20-27582
07/29/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings Vol II (Cont...). (SC).20-27583
07/29/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings Vol II (Cont...). (SC).20-27584
07/29/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Briefing Schedule/Bar Discipline. Due date: 30 days. If no opening brief is filed, the matter will be submitted for decision on the record without briefing or oral argument. (SC).20-27588
08/25/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief Due: September 11, 2020. (SC)20-31383
09/11/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (STRICKEN PER 11/12/20 ORDER). (SC)
09/11/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief (SC)20-33634
10/06/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-36713
10/12/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Strike Record, or in the Alternative Motion to Refile Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-37383
11/12/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Harold Gewerter has filed a motion requesting that this court strike the record and dismiss this disciplinary matter with prejudice. This court declines to strike the untimely record and dismiss this matter. Gewerter's motion for leave to file an amended opening brief is granted. The clerk of this court shall strike the opening brief filed on September 11, 2020. Amending opening brief due: 30 days. The State Bar shall have 30 days from the date the amended opening brief is filed to file and serve an amended answering brief. (SC)20-41276
12/22/2020MotionFiled Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel. (SC)20-46176
12/31/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Thomas F. Pitaro, counsel for Harold Gewerter, has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel of record. The motion is granted. NRAP 46(d)(3)(A), (B). The clerk shall remove Mr. Pitaro as counsel of record. Notice of appearance due: 30 days. (SC)20-47042
04/12/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This matter shall be submitted for a decision on the record without briefing or oral argument. (SC)21-10358
04/12/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)
04/23/2021Order/Dispositional BarFiled Order of Suspension. "Commencing from the date of this order, we hereby impose a one-year suspension on attorney Harold P. Gewerter's practice of law in Nevada based on the misconduct in Docket No. 81540, and a four-year concurrent suspension on his practice of law based on the misconduct in Docket No. 81817." Silver, J., with whom Herndon, J., agrees, dissenting. En Banc. Nos. 81540/81817.21-11753
04/29/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice to the Courts. (SC)21-12292
05/19/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-14395
05/19/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
08/06/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by Bar Counsel on July 25, 2021. (SC)21-14395