Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81553
Short Caption:ALEGRIA (ALEXIS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):81553-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR191013Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/30/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
07/30/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-27803
07/30/2020Transcript RequestFiled Notice: No Request for Transcripts. (SC)20-27807
08/10/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)20-29340
11/24/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-42766
11/24/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Forward Presentence Investigation Report to this Court. (SC)20-42767
11/24/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 1. (SC)20-42768
11/25/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Presentence Investigation Report. The motion to direct the district court clerk to transmit a copy of the presentence investigation report in this matter (district court case number CR19-1013) is granted. Due: 14 days. (SC)20-42960
12/03/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Presentence Investigation Report (SEALED). (SC)
12/24/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Marilee Cate, Deputy District Attorney, and hereby gives notice of appearance as counsel for Respondent in the above-captioned matter. (SC)20-46551
12/24/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-46552
01/22/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice (No Reply Brief). (SC)21-01933
01/22/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
03/01/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).21-05959
03/01/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
04/12/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MR/JT/BB (SC)
05/10/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
05/10/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-13256
05/10/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
05/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 12, 2021. (SC)21-13256