Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81570
Short Caption:CMM-CM, LLC VS. NEV. STATE LABOR COMM'RCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):81039, 81039-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 19OC002211BClassification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:En Banc Reconsider Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/03/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (SC)
08/03/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-28217
08/03/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)20-28223
08/04/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC)20-28389
08/04/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Wolf Rifkin Shapiro Schulman & Rabkin. Check no. 4271. (SC)
08/07/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC)20-29157
08/18/2020Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)20-30436
08/21/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries updated docket sheet. (SC)20-30909
08/24/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeal. (SC)20-31110
10/14/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address for Andrea Nichols. (SC)20-37799
11/25/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 16, 2020. (SC)20-43114
12/16/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 1. (SC)20-45543
12/16/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 2. (SC)20-45546
12/16/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 3. (SC)20-45547
12/16/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 4. (SC)20-45553
12/16/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 5. (SC)20-45555
12/16/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 6. (SC)20-45556
12/16/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 7. (SC)20-45557
12/16/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 8. (SC)20-45559
12/16/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 9. (SC)20-45561
12/16/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 10. (SC)20-45562
12/16/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-45599
01/07/2021MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Answering Briefs. (SC)21-00472
01/07/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Real Parties in Interest's Answering Briefs due: February 16, 2021. (SC)21-00483
02/16/2021BriefFiled Respondent's (Robert Conway and Louis DeSalvio) Answering Brief. (SC)21-04507
02/16/2021BriefFiled Respondent's (Salvador Plascencia) Answering Brief. (SC)21-04562
02/16/2021BriefFiled Respondent's (Nevada State Labor Commissioner) Answering Brief. (SC)21-04563
02/16/2021AppendixFiled Respondent's (Salvador Plascencia) Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 1-3. (SC)21-04565
02/19/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Change of Address for Law Firm. (SC)21-05009
04/01/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Omnibus Reply Brief. (SC)21-09487
04/02/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Pursuant to a telephonic request received on March 11, 2021, the time to file the reply brief was extended to April 1, 2021. See NRAP 26(b)(1)(B). The reply brief was filed on April 1, 2021. (SC)21-09535
04/02/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/08/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Expedited Oral Argument. (SC)21-10148
04/12/2021MotionFiled Respondent's (Salvador Plascencia) Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Expedited Oral Argument. (SC)21-10513
04/15/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondents' (Nevada Labor Commissioner's) Joinder in Southwest Regional Council's Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Expedited Oral Argument. (SC)21-10880
04/15/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Motion Real Parties in Interest Nevada Foundation for Fair Contracting and Ironworkers Local 433's Joinder to Southwest Regional Council's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Expedite Oral Argument. (SC)21-10890
04/19/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion for Expedited Oral Argument. (SC)21-11236
04/30/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a motion requesting that this court expedite oral argument to "the earliest possible argument date available on this court's docket." As this court has yet to determine that oral argument is necessary in this appeal, the motion is denied without prejudice. (SC)21-12459
07/09/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn6[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] JH/RP/MG (SC)21-19799
07/27/2021Petition/BarFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 7/27/21) (SC)
07/27/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-21761
07/28/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-21910
07/28/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Robert J. Kern. (SC)
08/10/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). JH/RP/MG. (SC)21-23172
08/24/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)Y21-24677
09/09/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Respondents' answer due: 14 days. (SC)21-26113