Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81571
Short Caption:MELTON (MAYSEN) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C329225Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/16/2020How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/03/2020Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
08/03/2020Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)20-28243
08/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. (SC)20-28244
08/19/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Real party in interest's answer due: 14 days. Petitioner shall have 7 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. (SC)20-30628
09/02/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (John Niman, Deputy District Attorney as Counsel for Real Party in Interest). (SC)20-32438
09/02/2020Petition/WritFiled Respondent's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)20-32439
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Volume 1. (SC)20-32440
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Volume 2. (SC)20-32441
09/08/2020Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition. (SC)20-33113
11/16/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)20-41665
09/01/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus. "ORDER the petition DENIED." JH/RP/EC (SC)21-25527
09/02/2021MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Motion to Publish. (SC)Y21-25636