Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81575
Short Caption:HOME WARRANTY ADM'R OF NEV., INC. VS. NEV. COMM'R OF INS.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 20OC000301BClassification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/03/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (SC)
08/03/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-28271
08/03/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)20-28273
08/04/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC)20-28394
08/04/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Battle Born Process Service. Check no. 2776. (SC)
08/24/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-31185
11/30/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 16, 2020. (SC)20-43296
12/01/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time for Filing Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (SC)20-43507
12/01/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/17/20. To Court Reporter: Oasis Reporting Services, LLC. (SC)20-43508
12/07/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the transcript request form is granted. The transcript request form was filed on December 1, 2020. (SC)20-44339
12/16/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-45616
12/16/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume I of III. (SC)20-45619
12/16/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume II of III. (SC)20-45620
12/16/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume III of III. (SC)20-45621
01/13/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents' answering brief due: January 29, 2021. (SC)21-01074
01/13/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Jeffrey M. Conner, Deputy Solicitor General as counsel for respondents). (SC)21-01078
01/29/2021BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC)21-02928
02/01/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Respondents' Answering Brief's Coversheet. (SC)21-02998
02/26/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply Brief due: March 15, 2021. (SC)21-05697
03/15/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-07389
03/15/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
05/20/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant Home Warranty Adm'r of Nev., Inc. shall have 14 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as moot. Respondents may file any reply within 7 days from the date that HWAN's response is served. (SC)21-14545
06/03/2021MotionFiled Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal. (SC)21-15958
06/10/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. The stipulation is approved. "This appeal is dismissed with each party to bear its own costs and attorney fees." Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC).21-16715