Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81583
Short Caption:GILMAN VS. TOLL C/W 81726/81874Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:81583*, 81726, 81874Related Case(s):78333, 81726, 81874
Lower Court Case(s):Storey Co. - First Judicial District - 18TRT000011EClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Reinstated
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/13/2020 / Wasick, DavidSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/05/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
08/05/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-28707
08/05/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-28712
08/05/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-28714
08/05/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (SC)20-28771
08/12/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Flangas McMillan Law Group. Check no. 1655. (SC)
08/12/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).20-29793
08/13/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David Wasick. (SC).20-29974
09/02/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-32397
09/02/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-32444
09/04/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Settlement Judge - Docketing Statement). (SC)20-32755
10/20/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. Case Nos. 81583/81726/81874. (SC).20-38341
10/21/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals, Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. Nos. 81583/81726/81874. (SC)20-38575