Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81590
Short Caption:PERRY VS. KLCC HOLDINGS 1 LTD.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1900899Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:En Banc Reconsider Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:08/17/2020 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/15/2021How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/06/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
08/06/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-28952
08/06/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-28954
08/14/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Lex Domus Law. Check no. 1001. (SC)
08/17/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).20-30243
08/17/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (SC).20-30263
08/18/2020Docketing StatementFiled Respondent's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC)20-30471
08/28/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC)20-31873
08/31/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC)20-31984
09/10/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/10/2019 To Court Reporter: Julie Kernan (SC)20-33313
10/01/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Julie Kernan stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/10/2019 (SC)20-36109
11/23/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Stay of District Court Proceedings Pending Appeal. (SC).20-42574
11/23/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC).20-42581
11/24/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Appellant's Motion to Stay District Court Proceedings. (SC).20-42889
11/25/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vols. 1 - 3 with (CD-ROM). (SC)20-43125
12/04/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Reply to Respondent's Response to Motion for Stay of District Court Proceedings Pending Appeal (REJECTED PER 12/4/20 NOTICE). (SC)
12/04/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document "Appellant's Reply to Respondent's Response to Motion for Stay of District Court Proceedings Pending Appeal". (SC)20-44027
12/14/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Stay. The district court's proceedings in case no. CV19-00899 are stayed, pending further order of this court. We remand this matter to the district court for the limited purpose of determining the appropriate amount of the bond. The district court shall determine the bond amount within 30 days from the date of this order, and the clerk shall transmit a copy of the bond order to this court. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of the district court's order setting the amount of the bond in which to post the bond and submit proof to the clerk of this court that the bond has been posted. (SC)20-45236
12/23/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-46306
01/14/2021Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Bond Order After Remand filed in district court on 1/14/21. (SC)21-01257
01/20/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-01631
01/21/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Modify Bond Order. (SC)21-01745
01/22/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
01/29/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion and for Limited Remand. Appellant has filed a motion to modify bond order. This court declines to modify the amount ordered by the district court at this time. Accordingly the motion is denied. However, this matter is again remanded to the district court for the limited purpose of complying with the requirements under McCullough. The district court shall have until February 16, 2021, to enter an amended written order that sets forth its specific and substantive reasoning for ordering a bond in an amount less than the full judgment for appellant. Upon entry of the written order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit a certified copy of the order to the clerk of this court. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of the district court's order, should the district court set a different amount for the bond than $5,000, in which to post the bond and submit proof to the clerk of this court that the bond has been posted. (SC)21-02803
02/09/2021Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of the Amended Order After Remand filed in district court on 2/9/21. (SC)21-03852
03/09/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Vacate Stay. (SC)21-06764
03/19/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Vacating Stay. As of this date, appellant has failed to post bond or submit proof to this court that bond has been posted. Accordingly, respondent's motion to vacate the stay is granted, and the stay of the district court proceedings is vacated, allowing respondent to proceed with execution of its judgment. (SC)21-07998
04/15/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)21-10911
07/01/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP21-EC/KP/DH (SC)21-18908
07/16/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: August 2, 2021. (SC)21-20627
07/27/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-21718
08/02/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-22464
08/02/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Daniel S. Cereghino. (SC)
08/04/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This court takes no action in regard to appellant's July 27, 2021, motion for an extension of time to file a petition for rehearing. The petition for rehearing was timely filed on August 2, 2021. (SC)21-22643
08/16/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC)21-23721
08/30/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant Perry's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (REJECTED PER 8/31/21 NOTICE). (SC)21-25279
08/31/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)21-25348
09/03/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)Y21-25679
09/17/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Answer due: 14 days. (SC)21-27057