Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81617
Short Caption:EBEL VS. BRIGGSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A793145Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:08/14/2020 / Chapin, PatrickSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/12/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
08/12/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-29830
08/12/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-29833
08/12/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-29835
08/12/2020Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Jerome R. Bowen. (SC)
08/14/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).20-30049
08/14/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Patrick N. Chapin. (SC).20-30094
08/17/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (SC)20-30347
08/28/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-31888
09/09/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for October 26, 2020. (SC)20-33217
10/01/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys (Steven T. Jaffee and Taylor R. Anderson of Hall Jaffee & Clayton, LLP agrees to be substituted in the place of The Law Offices of S. Denise McCurry as counsel for respondents). (SC)20-36094
10/26/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC).20-39155
10/27/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-39284
11/02/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/10/19 and 07/15/20. To Court Reporter: Department VI. (SC)20-39856
01/15/2021MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Appellants Opening Brief (First Request). (SC)21-01453
01/15/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief due: February 24, 2021. (SC)21-01512
02/22/2021MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief (Second Request). (SC)21-05159
02/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to serve and file, in this court, an amended transcript request form that fully complies with NRAP 9(a). Appellant shall have until March 26, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)21-05826
03/01/2021Transcript RequestFiled Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/10/19 and 07/15/20. To Court Reporter: De'Awna Takas (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 03/01/21). (SC)
03/01/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC)21-05981
03/01/2021Transcript RequestFiled Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/10/19 and 07/15/20. To Court Reporter: De'Awna Takas. (SC)21-05992
03/30/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)21-09207
03/31/2021MotionFiled Respondents' Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Countermotion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)21-09330
04/05/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 4/16/21). (SC)
04/05/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume I. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 4/16/21). (SC)
04/16/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "This appeal is dismissed." The clerk shall strike the opening brief and appendix filed on April 5, 2021. SNP21-JH/RP/AS (SC)21-11008
05/04/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-12817
05/04/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Jerome R. Bowen. (SC)
05/18/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Answer due: 14 days. (SC)21-14246
06/01/2021BriefFiled Respondents' Answer and Opposition to Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-15458
06/15/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC)21-17231
06/28/2021MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief (Petition for En Banc Reconsideration). (First Request). (SC)21-18550
06/30/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Appellant's petition for en banc reconsideration due: July 6, 2021. (SC)21-18805
07/01/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)21-19040
07/20/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." HARDESTY, C.J., dissenting. EN BANC. (SC)21-20817
08/16/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-23803
08/16/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
09/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 17, 2021. (SC)21-23803