Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81619
Short Caption:KADMIRI VS. MGM GRAND RESORTS INT'LCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):81900, 81900-COA, 81903
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A799553Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/13/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC)
08/13/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-29890
08/13/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)20-29892
08/24/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." SNP20-MG/LS/AS (SC)20-31054
08/25/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Minutes. (SC)20-31310
08/28/2020Transcript RequestFiled Proper Person Appellant's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/28/20 and 2/13/20. To Court Reporter: not given. (SC)20-31861
09/01/2020BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Appeal Brief (Informal). (SC)20-32161
09/01/2020Docketing StatementFiled Proper Person Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)20-32162
09/18/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).20-34406
09/18/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
10/01/2020RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 21, 2020. (SC)20-34406