Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81625
Short Caption:CHRISTOPHER HOME RIDGES, LLC VS. MEIME, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):67814, 76406
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A602284Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Chief Justice Hardesty for Justice ParraguirrePanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/13/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
08/13/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-29984
08/13/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-29986
08/14/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Hayes Wakayama. Check no. 1008. (SC)
08/17/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).20-30249
08/17/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC).20-30271
08/31/2020Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested. (SC)20-32060
09/02/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-32423
12/15/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant shall have until December 29, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix (SC)20-45380
12/29/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-46874
12/29/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief (Volume 1 of 2). (SC)20-46877
12/29/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief (Volume 2 of 2). (SC)20-46876
01/25/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's answering brief due: February 11, 2021. (SC)21-02212
02/11/2021BriefFiled Respondent Meime, LLC's Answering Brief. (SC)21-04161
02/11/2021AppendixFiled Respondent Meime, LLC's Appendix to Answering Brief - Volume 1. (SC)21-04163
03/15/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-07520
03/16/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
05/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." JH/LS/AS. (SC)21-13946
06/08/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-16354
06/08/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 9, 2021. (SC)21-16354