Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81658
Short Caption:POSTEL VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 20PBT000531BClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/27/2021How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/20/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Day R. Williams. Check no. 2298. (SC)
08/20/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-30716
08/20/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)20-30718
08/21/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC).20-30873
09/08/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC)20-32986
09/08/2020Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)20-32987
12/08/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. (SC)20-44530
12/08/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 2. (SC)20-44538
12/08/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1. (SC)20-44539
12/08/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-44540
01/07/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-00392
02/25/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed. (SC)
05/27/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)21-15271
05/27/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP21-EC/KP/DH21-15273
06/21/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-17753
06/21/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/02/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 23, 2021. (SC)21-17753