Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 81665
Short Caption:SATICOY BAY, LLC, SER. 9937 LA PACA AVE. VS. U.S. BANK NAT'L ASS'NCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A783844Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/31/2020 / Turner, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/21/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
08/21/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-30863
08/21/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-30875
08/21/2020Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Roger P. Croteau. (SC)
08/24/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-31093
08/31/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William C. Turner. (SC)20-31956
09/11/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)20-33578
10/02/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for: TBA. (SC).20-36364
11/18/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Other. After further discussions with counsel, the Settlement Judge has determined this case should be removed from the settlement program. (SC)20-42083
11/19/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC)20-42232
11/25/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/25/19 and 03/11/20. To Court Reporter: Lisa Lizotte. (SC)20-43052
02/01/2021TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lisa A. Lizotte stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/25/19 and 03/11/20. (SC)21-03013
02/12/2021MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend time to Submit Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)21-04303
02/17/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have until April 2, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix.21-04649
03/17/2021MotionFiled Joint Motion for Remand to Eighth Judicial District Court and Request for Dismissal of Appeal. (SC)21-07728
04/01/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to Submit Opening Brief and Appendix. (Second Request)(SC)21-09432
04/02/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order of Limited Remand. This appeal is remanded to the district court for the limited purpose of allowing the district court to vacate the order appealed from and to conduct further proceedings. The district court shall have 90 days from the date of this order to transmit to this court its written order resolving the issue. The proceedings in this court are suspended pending further order of this court. (SC)21-09526
06/30/2021Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on June 29, 2021. Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment. (SC)21-18746
07/06/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file a motion or stipulation to dismiss this appeal or to inform this court in writing that appellant intends to proceed with this appeal. Briefing suspended. (SC)21-19342
07/13/2021MotionFiled Stipulation of Dismissal. (SC)Y21-20163
07/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and cause appearing, this appeal is hereby dismissed. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC)21-20323