Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81680
Short Caption:UNITEDHEALTH GRP., INC. VS. DIST. CT. (FREMONT EMERGENCY SERVS. (MANDAVIA), LTD.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A792978Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/15/2021How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/25/2020Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from D. Lee Roberts, Jr. (SC)
08/25/2020Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition, or, Alternatively, Mandamus. (SC)20-31316
08/25/2020MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Exceed Word Limit for Writ of Prohibition, or, Alternatively, Mandamus. (SC)20-31317
08/25/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (SC)20-31318
08/25/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (SC)20-31319
08/25/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3. (SC)20-31320
08/25/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4. (SC)20-31322
08/25/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5. (SC)20-31323
08/28/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner's Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Writ of Prohibition, or, Alternatively, Mandamus. (SC)20-31884
09/21/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Real Parties in Interest's Answer due: 28 days. Petitioners shall have 14 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. fn1[Good cause appearing, we also grant petitioners' motion to exceed word length. In the interest of fairness, real parties in interest may likewise file an answer not to exceed 13,993 words the length of petitioners' writ petition.] (SC)20-34655
10/13/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Real parties in interest's answer to writ petition due: November 2, 2020. (SC)20-37447
11/02/2020BriefFiled Real Parties in Interest Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition, or, Alternatively, Mandamus. (SC)20-39935
11/02/2020AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest Appendix in Support of Answer to Petition. (SC)20-39936
11/16/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Petitioners' Reply due: November 30, 2020. (SC)20-41667
11/20/2020MotionFiled Petitioners' Motion to Stay the Underlying District Court Case Pending Resolution of Its Petition for Writ of Prohibition, or, Alternatively, Mandamus. (SC)20-42547
11/20/2020AppendixFiled Petitioners' Appendix in Support of Petitioners' Motion to Stay the Underlying District Court Case - Vol. 1. (SC)20-42548
11/20/2020AppendixFiled Petitioners' Appendix Appendix in Support of Petitioners' Motion to Stay the Underlying District Court Case - Vol. 2. (SC)20-42549
11/30/2020MotionFiled Real Parties in Interest Opposition to Motion to Stay. (SC)20-43357
11/30/2020MotionFiled Petitioners' Motion for Leave to Exceed Word Limit for Reply in Support of Writ of Prohibition, or, Alternatively, Mandamus. (SC)20-43386
11/30/2020Petition/WritFiled Petitioners' Reply to Answer to Petition. (SC)20-43387
11/30/2020AppendixFiled Petitioners' Appendix to Reply Brief. Vol. 6 (SC)20-43388
12/01/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
12/07/2020MotionFiled Reply in Support of Petitioners' Motion to Stay the Underlying District Court Case Pending Resolution of Its Petition for Writ of Prohibition, or, Alternatively, Mandamus. (SC)20-44396
12/16/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice Real Parties in Interest Notice of Supplemental Authority. (SC) (STRICKEN PER 02/08/21 ORDER)
12/31/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion for Stay and Granting Motion to Exceed Word Limit for Reply. We deny the motion for stay. We grant petitioners' motion to exceed the word limit for their real parties in interest's answer. The reply was filed on November 30, 2020. (SC)20-47074
01/14/2021MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion to Strike, or, in the Alternative, Response to Real Parties in Interest's Notice of Supplemental Authority. (SC)21-01291
02/08/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Strike. The clerk shall strike the notice of supplemental authority filed on December 16, 2020. (SC).21-03777
03/16/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Real Parties in Interest Notice of Supplemental Authority. (SC)21-07593
03/16/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Real Parties in Interest Notice of Supplemental Authority. (SC)21-07652
04/09/2021BriefFiled Petitioners' Response to Real Parties in Interest's Notice of Supplement Authority. (SC)21-10256
04/15/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)21-10910
06/03/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioners' Notice of Appearance for Daniel F. Polsenberg, Joel D. Henriod, and Abraham G. Smith. (SC)21-15967
07/01/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP21-EC/KP/DH (SC)21-18915
07/26/2021RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)21-21535
07/26/2021Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)