Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81687
Short Caption:TYRONE & IN-CHING, LLC VS. BAYVIEW LOAN SERV., LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):77830
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A704745Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/26/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
08/26/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-31438
08/26/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-31440
08/26/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-31442
09/01/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (SC)20-32325
09/08/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Hong & Hong. Check no. 3656. (SC)
09/08/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-32973
09/10/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC)20-33320
09/23/2020Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)20-35124
09/29/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Docketing Statement. (SC)20-35808
09/30/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Appellant's First Motion to Extend Time to File Docketing Statement. (SC)20-35816
09/30/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Reply in Support of First Motion to Extend Time to File Docketing Statement. (SC)20-35941
10/07/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-36869
10/09/2020Transcript RequestFiled Respondent's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/19/20. To Court Reporter/Transcriber for Department 30. (SC)20-37220
10/09/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)20-37225
10/14/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The opposed motion for an extension of time to file the docketing statement is granted. The docketing statement was filed on October 7, 2020. (SC)20-37692
10/15/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Response to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss due: November 2, 2020. (SC)20-37892
11/02/2020MotionFiled Appellant, Tyrone & In-Ching, LLC's, Response to Respondent, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC's, Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)20-39942
11/04/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)20-40133
11/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Dismiss. Respondent moves to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. The motion to dismiss is denied. (SC).20-41464
11/17/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Recorder Vanessa Medina stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/19/20. (SC)20-41960
12/11/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 22, 2021. (SC)20-44988
01/22/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)21-02114
01/29/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for a second extension of time to file the opening brief and appendix. The motion is denied. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)21-02818
02/11/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 1. (SC)21-04219
02/11/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 2. (SC)21-04220
02/12/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)21-04372
02/16/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Answering Brief due: March 29, 2021. (SC)21-04539
03/25/2021MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend the Deadline to File Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-08545
03/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This court elects to treat the stipulation as a joint motion. The joint motion is granted. Respondent shall have until April 12, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)21-08752
04/09/2021MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. (SC)21-10347
04/13/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and cause appearing, "this appeal is dismissed". The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC)21-10655