Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81701
Short Caption:TOUSSAINT (ANNISSA) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR200031Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
08/28/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-31796
09/08/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Isolde Zihn stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts:4/29/2020. (SC)20-32963
09/08/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)20-32983
12/04/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-44034
12/04/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. (SC)20-44037
12/04/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Forward Presentence Investigation Reports to this Court. (SC)20-44038
12/07/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Transmit Presentence Investigation Report. Due: 14 days. (SC)20-44308
12/14/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Presentence Investigation Report (SEALED). (SC)
01/04/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Kevin Naughton. (SC)21-00009
01/04/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-00010
01/04/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice (No Reply Brief). (SC)21-00056
01/04/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
05/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of conviction REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-13933
06/08/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-16356
06/08/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 10, 2021. (SC)21-16356