Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81706
Short Caption:OAKSMITH VS. DIST. CT. (ROSAS)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial DistrictClassification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2020Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Joseph J. Troiano. (SC)
08/28/2020Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (SC)20-31893
08/28/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ Petitioner's Index of Exhibits Vol. 1-4.(REJECTED PER NOTICE 8/31/20) (SC)
08/28/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ Petitioner's Index of Exhibits Vol. 5-8. (REJECTED PER NOTICE 8/31/20) (SC).
08/28/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ Petitioner's Index of Exhibits Vol. 9-10.(REJECTED PER NOTICE 8/31/20) (SC)
08/31/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC)20-31927
09/02/2020Petition/WritFiled Amended Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition to Conform with Resubmitted Appendix. (SC)20-32402
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Petitioner's Appendix of Exhibits - Volume 1. (SC)20-32404
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Petitioner's Appendix of Exhibits - Volume 2. (SC)20-32405
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Petitioner's Appendix of Exhibits - Volume 3. (SC)20-32408
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Petitioner's Appendix of Exhibits - Volume 4. (SC)20-32409
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Petitioner's Appendix of Exhibits - Volume 5. (SC)20-32410
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Petitioner's Appendix of Exhibits - Volume 6. (SC)20-32411
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Petitioner's Appendix of Exhibits - Volume 7. (SC)20-32412
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Petitioner's Appendix of Exhibits - Volume 8. (SC)20-32415
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Petitioner's Appendix of Exhibits - Volume 9. (SC)20-32416
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Petitioner's Appendix of Exhibits - Volume 10. (SC)20-32418
11/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Answer due: 28 days. (SC)20-41463
12/09/2020BriefFiled Cesar Rosas' Answer to Amended Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (SC)20-44751
12/11/2020Petition/WritFiled Answer to Amended Petition for Writ Real Party in Interesnt (Loya Insurance's). (SC)20-45134
12/17/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Petitioner's reply to real party in interest's answer to petition for writ due: January 11, 2021. (SC)20-45645
01/11/2021Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply to Answer in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (SC)21-00852
04/16/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-11072
05/11/2021RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)21-13470
05/11/2021Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)