Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81711
Short Caption:JORCIN VS. ALLENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):79632, 79637
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A709521Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/31/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
08/31/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-32012
08/31/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-32015
08/31/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-32017
09/28/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellants have not paid the filing fee of otherwise responded to this court's notice. Accordingly, "this appeal is dismissed." (SC)20-35586
10/16/2020Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Brandon L. Phillips. (PAYMENT REFUNDED PER ORDER FILED 10/28/20). (SC)
10/16/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Motion (Motion for Reconsideration per NRAP 27). (SC)20-38196
10/28/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Appeal. This appeal was dismissed by way of a clerk's order on September 28, 2020, for failure to pay the filing fee. Thereafter, appellants filed a petition for rehearing, which this court has construed as a motion for reconsideration pursuant to NRAP 27(c)(3)(A). The motion is granted and this appeal is reinstated. The clerk of this court shall deposit check number 2222 in the amount of $250. fn1[The clerk of this court shall refund the $150 rehearing fee tendered by appellant on September 28, 2020, and return check number 2221 written in the amount of $150 as no fee is due for a motion seeking reconsideration of a clerk's order.]. (SC)20-39432
10/28/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Brandon L Phillips Attorney at Law PLLC - check no. 2222. (SC)
11/05/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).20-40409
11/09/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellants: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC).20-40889
11/09/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC).20-40892
11/24/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Request to Extend Time to File the Case Appeal Statement. (SC)20-42875
11/30/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellants' motion for an extension of time is granted to the following extent. Case appeal statement and docketing statement due: December 3, 2020. (SC)20-43310
01/07/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $250.00 or Case Appeal Statement, Transcript Request Form and Docketing Statement or Motion due: 14 days. (SC)21-00464
01/13/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/19/19 and 05/01/19. To Court Reporter: Matthew Yarbrough. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 01/13/21). (SC)
01/13/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (SC)21-01098
01/13/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/19/19 and 05/01/19. To Court Reporter: Matthew Yarbrough. (SC)21-01122
01/21/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (SC)21-01871
01/22/2021Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)21-01909
01/22/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)21-01921
01/22/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)21-01922
04/08/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal and Referring Counsel to the State Bar for Investigation. "We dismiss this appeal." Bar counsel shall, within 90 days of the date of this order, inform this court of the status or results of the investigation and any disciplinary proceedings in this matter. SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-10116
05/03/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-12531
05/03/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
05/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 4, 2021. (SC)21-12531
07/12/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Investigative Report. Investigative Report from the State Bar of Nevada re: attorney Brandon Phillips. Original report was placed in attorney's bar file. (SC).