Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0567
Short Caption:IN THE MATTER OF RESIDENTIAL SUMMARY EVICTION ACTIONS AND NOTICES DURING COVID-19Court:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:ADKT Order Filed
Filed Date:08/31/2020Public Hearing:
Closed Date:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/31/2020Administrative CaseFiled Petition.20-32070
08/31/2020Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Comment.20-32074
09/14/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Aria Overli.20-33675
09/15/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Carol Sorensen.20-33910
09/16/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Edward D. Kania.20-34002
09/16/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Rita Greggio.20-34021
09/16/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Emily Paulsen.20-34038
09/16/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from LaLo Montoya.20-34044
09/16/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Valeria Villasenor.20-34046
09/16/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Salma Garcia.20-34047
09/16/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Mark C. Bettencourt, Jr.20-34073
09/16/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Leo Murrieta.20-34091
09/16/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Judge Diana L. Sullivan.20-34095
09/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Alejandra Romero.20-34186
09/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Jordan A. Doctors.20-34191
09/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Lydia Nussbaum.20-34192
09/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Sue Meuschke.20-34193
09/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Brandt Butko.20-34194
09/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Eileen R. Piekarz.20-34195
09/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Elena Butko.20-34196
09/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Nevada's for the Common Good.20-34197
09/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Suzan Baucum.20-34198
09/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Christine Saunders.20-34199
09/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Human Services Network.20-34200
09/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Kristen Gooch.20-34201
09/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada.20-34202
09/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Mackenzie Warren.20-34203
09/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Terry Moore.20-34204
09/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Tiffany Banks.20-34205
09/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Bailey Bortolin.20-34207
09/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Daniel R. Hansen.20-34208
09/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Jordan F. Faux.20-34210
09/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from J.D. Klippenstein.20-34211
09/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Maria-Teresa Liebermann-Parraga.20-34212
09/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Courtney Errington.20-34213
09/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Christopher Storke.20-34214
09/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Al Tate.20-34215
09/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Zack Poppel.20-34216
09/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Laura Nguyen.20-34217
09/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Yanneth Romero.20-34218
09/18/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Diana Diaz.20-34399
09/18/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from the Northern Nevada Regional Organizing Group.20-34520
09/22/2020Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket. (SC)
09/23/2020Administrative CaseFiled Supplemented Document Requested from Public Hearing.20-35004
09/28/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Jennifer M. Richards.20-35574
09/29/2020Administrative CaseFiled Circulation of Proposed Temporary Residential Summary Eviction Mediation Rules and Order Inviting Additional Comment.20-35796
10/02/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Mark McKee.20-36195
10/02/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Jackie Akester.20-36218
10/02/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Robin Sweet.20-36257
10/02/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Marine Thuet.20-36260
10/02/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Deirdre Felgar.20-36264
10/02/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Geoconda Arguello-Kline.20-36292
10/02/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Emily Paulsen.20-36295
10/02/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Joe Slyman, Jr.20-36297
10/02/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Roger Wu.20-36331
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Margaret Crowley.20-36388
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from William Shogren.20-36389
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Paul Lychuk.20-36390
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Geoconda Arguello-Kline.20-36391
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Judge Diana L. Sullivan.20-36392
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Bonnie Barberini.20-36395
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Craig Kintner.20-36396
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Mark and Susan Thomas.20-36398
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Craig Steven.20-36399
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Robert An.20-36401
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Lars Romeis.20-36402
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Rodney and Inger Jordan.20-36403
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Frank Voyton.20-36404
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Margaret Matherly.20-36406
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Mike Pellicano.20-36407
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Morgan F. Shah.20-36408
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Mark Bivins.20-36429
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Tim Sevilla.20-36430
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from James Conway.20-36448
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Farahnaz H. Zadeh.20-36449
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Barbara Buckley and Jim Berchtold.20-36455
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Jennifer Richards.20-36456
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Lalo Montoya.20-36457
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Bailey Bortolin.20-36458
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Rita Greggio.20-36459
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Terry A. Moore.20-36461
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Ji Zhang.20-36512
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Jim Yu.20-36513
10/05/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Leslie Steadman.20-36514
10/06/2020Administrative CaseFiled Order Adopting the Temporary Residential Summary Eviction Mediation Rules.20-36666
10/09/2020Administrative CaseFiled Correction to Supplemented Document Requested from Public Hearing.20-37249
10/13/2020Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Mediators.20-37584
10/14/2020Administrative CaseFiled Corrected Order Appointing Mediators. (Correction made to fix typo in Persi Mishel's name).20-37656
10/14/2020Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Home Means Nevada as Administrator of the Temporary Residential Summary Eviction Program.20-37761
10/16/2020Administrative CaseFiled Order Correcting Order Adopting the Temporary Residential Summary Eviction Mediation Rules.20-38158
10/19/2020Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Mediators.20-38266
11/16/2020Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Mediators. (see order for list).20-41711
11/25/2020Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Mediators. (see order for list).20-42980
12/01/2020Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Mediators. (see order for list).20-43509
12/14/2020Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Mediators. (see order for list).20-45230
03/04/2021Administrative CaseA Clean Copy of Exhibit A, Adopting the Temporary Residential Summary Eviction Mediation Rules.21-06364
03/29/2021Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Mediators. (see order for list).21-08993
04/08/2021Administrative CaseFiled Order Extending the Temporary Residential Summary Eviction Mediation Rules.21-10186
04/09/2021Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing.21-10218
04/09/2021Administrative CaseFiled Corrected Order Extending the Temporary Residential Summary Eviction Mediation Rules.21-10242
05/06/2021Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Mediators. (see order for list).21-12965
05/11/2021Administrative CaseFiled Our Nevada Judges, Requests Permission to Broadcast and Record the Public Hearing Scheduled in, Nevada Supreme Court ADKT 0567, for June 3, 2021, at 3:00 P.M..21-13982
05/13/2021Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Mediator (Dana Middleton).21-13791
05/14/2021Administrative CaseFiled Order. Our Nevada Judges has submitted a request seeking access to the public hearing in ADKT 0567 for the purpose of photographic or electronic coverage of the hearing scheduled for June 3, 2021, beginning at 3:00 p.m. Because there is no physical location for this hearing and the hearing may be accessed in accordance with this court's order filed in ADKT 0567 on April 9, 2021, Our Nevada Judges' request is denied as moot.21-13984
05/27/2021Administrative CaseFiled Comments from the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada.21-15267
06/03/2021Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Susan Hallahan.21-15749
06/03/2021Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Shannon Chambers, Home Means Nevada.21-15908
06/03/2021Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket. (SC)
06/25/2021Administrative CaseFiled Order Approving Amendments to Eviction Mediation Rules for Designated Eviction Proceedings.21-18280
07/02/2021Administrative CaseFiled Amended Order Approving Amendments to Eviction Mediation Rules for Designated Eviction Proceedings.21-19083
07/07/2021Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Mediators (Jamie Leavitt and Dana Middleton).21-19404
07/15/2021Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Mediators (Karen Hanks and Leon Mead).21-20395
08/30/2021Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Mediator (Eva Jimenez).21-25174
09/15/2021Administrative CaseClean Copy of Exhibit A to the Order Approving Amendments to Eviction Mediation Rules for Designated Eviction Proceedings.21-26640