Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81726
Short Caption:GILMAN VS. TOLL C/W 81583/81874Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:81583*, 81726, 81874Related Case(s):78333, 81583, 81874
Lower Court Case(s):Storey Co. - First Judicial District - 18TRT000011EClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Reinstated
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/11/2020 / Wasick, DavidSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/01/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
09/01/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-32267
09/01/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-32271
09/10/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Flangas McMillan Law Group. Check no. 1662. (SC)
09/10/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-33359
09/11/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David Wasick. (SC)20-33513
10/01/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC)20-36082
10/01/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge, (SC)20-36151
10/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. (SC)20-36672
10/20/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. Case Nos. 81583/81726/81874. (SC).20-38342
10/21/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals, Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. Nos. 81583/81726/81874. (SC)20-38575
10/27/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Due on Cross-Appeal (Sam Toll). Nos. 81583/81726/81874. (SC)
10/27/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Cross-Appeal (Sam Toll). Nos. 81583/81726/81874. (SC)20-39324
10/27/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee on Cross-Appeal. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. Nos. 81583/81726/81874. (SC)20-39326
10/29/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Luke Busby, LTD. Check No. 814. Nos. 81583/81726/81874. (SC)