Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81730
Short Caption:WEITZ, ESQ. VS. STATE BAR OF NEV.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:05/04/2021 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:05/04/2021How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/03/2020Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from J. Colby Williams. (SC)
09/03/2020Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition. (SC)20-32507
09/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (SC)20-32508
09/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (SC)20-32509
09/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3. (SC)20-32510
10/02/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Real party in interest's answer due: 28 days. (SC)20-36307
10/26/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Real party in interest's answer to the petition for writ of prohibition due: November 16, 2020. (SC)20-39054
11/16/2020Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest State Bar of Nevada's Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition. (SC).20-41769
11/30/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Petitioners' Reply in Support of Petition due: December 14, 2020. (SC)20-43306
12/07/2020Petition/WritFiled Reply to State Bar of Nevada's Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition. (SC)20-44389
03/03/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on April 8, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. The argument will be video conferenced. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection. Within 7 days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the phone number and email address of the attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. (SC)21-06192
03/24/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)21-08386
03/24/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioners' Notice of Supplemental Authority to NRAP 31(e). (SC)21-08399
03/25/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner's Notice of Change of Address. (SC)21-08642
04/13/2021MotionFiled Petitioners' Motion to Re-Calendar En Banc Oral Argument. (SC)21-10656
04/13/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Rescheduling Oral Argument. The clerk of this court shall reschedule this matter for oral argument on May 4, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. (SC)21-10719
04/19/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)21-11169
05/04/2021Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. 81730. (SC)
07/21/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition. "ORDER the petition GRANTED AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF PROHIBITION instructing the Southern Nevada Disciplinary Panel to dismiss the State Bar of Nevada's complaint." Stiglich, J., with whom Pickering, J., agrees, concurring. En Banc. (SC).21-20951
07/21/2021WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Attorney J. Colby Williams for service upon Southern Nevada Disciplinary Panel. (SC)21-20962
07/29/2021WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on The State Bar of Nevada Disciplinary Board on July 27, 2021.21-22054
08/16/2021RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)21-23806
08/16/2021Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)