Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81637-COA
Short Caption:KEOLIS TRANSIT SERVS., LLC VS. DIST. CT. (TOTH)Court:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):81637
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A797214Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/27/2021 at 3:00 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:04/27/2021How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/03/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
09/03/2020Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 09/03/20 NOTICE). (COA).Y20-32588
09/03/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 09/03/20 NOTICE). (COA).20-32589
10/16/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 28 days. Petitioner shall have 14 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. (COA)20-38132
11/12/2020Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest's Answer to Writ of Prohibition. (COA)20-41278
11/12/2020AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest's Appendix - Volume 1. (COA)20-41277
11/18/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Amicus Counsel - Micah S. Echols of Claggett & Sykes Law Firm and A.J. Sharp of Sharp Law Center Appearing as Counsel for Amicus Party Nevada Justice Association. (In support of Real Party in Interest). (SC)20-42125
11/18/2020MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief of the Nevada Justice Association (First Request). (SC)20-42126
11/25/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. NJA shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve any motion for leave to file a brief of amicus curiae and a copy of the proposed brief. (COA)20-43059
11/25/2020Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply Brief in Support of Writ of Prohibition. (COA)20-43147
12/28/2020MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief of the Nevada Justice Association (Second Request). (COA)20-46701
01/04/2021MotionFiled Petitioner's Opposition to Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief of the Nevada Justice Association. (COA)21-00068
01/07/2021MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief of the Nevada Justice Association (In Support of Real Party In Interest Shay Toth) (First Request). (COA)21-00486
01/07/2021BriefFiled Amicus Curiae Brief of the Nevada Justice Association (In Support of Real Party in Interest Shay Toth). (COA)21-00487
01/11/2021MotionFiled Reply in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief of the Nevada Justice Association. (COA)21-00856
01/15/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. The opposed motion of the Nevada Justice Association for a second extension of time to file a motion to file a brief of amicus curiae is granted. NRAP 26(b)(1)(A). The motion was filed on January 7, 2021. The motion for leave to file a brief of amicus curiae in support of real party in interest is granted. NRAP 29(a). The amicus brief was filed on January 7, 2021. Petitioner shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve any supplemental brief in response to the amicus brief. The supplemental brief shall not exceed 15 pages or the equivalent type-volume limitation. (COA)21-01481
01/29/2021BriefFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Brief in Response to Amicus Curiae Brief of the Nevada Justice Association. (SC)21-02779
03/16/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on April 27, 2021, at 3:00 p.m. Oral argument will be held by videoconference. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection. On or before March 31, 2021, petitioner and real party in interest shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the landline and cellular phone numbers and email address of that attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test the capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. (COA)21-07587
04/27/2021Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Court of Appeals. 81637-COA. (COA21-MG/BB/JT) (COA).