Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81735
Short Caption:RUPERTS COURT TR. VS. FED. NAT'L MORTG. ASS'NCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A706432Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/08/2020 / Young, JaySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/03/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
09/03/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-32612
09/03/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-32615
09/03/2020Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Roger P. Croteau. (SC)
09/04/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-32696
09/08/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jay Young. (SC)20-33092
09/25/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement, Part 1. (SC)20-35389
09/25/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement, Part 2 - Exhibits. (SC)20-35391
10/05/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for November 5, 2020, at 9:00 am. (SC).20-36559
11/05/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 10, 2020, at 9:00 am. (SC).20-40412
12/08/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement process is continued to the following date: December 21, 2020, at 11:00 AM via BlueJeans video conferencing. (SC)20-44704
12/21/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties have agreed to enter into a stipulation that the validity of the HOA sale is not an issue being considered in this appeal and is dismissed from the appeal. The remainder of the appeal will go forward, as the parties were unable to come to an agreement regarding the same. (SC)20-46114
12/31/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-46995
01/06/2021Transcript RequestFiled Certificate that No Transcript is Being Requested. (SC)21-00343
03/30/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 14, 2021. (SC)21-09050
04/13/2021MotionFiled Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Submit Opening Brief and Appendix (Second Request). (SC)21-10707
04/22/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have until May 14, 2021, to file and serve either a motion or stipulation to dismiss the appeal or the opening brief and appendix. (SC)21-11664
05/03/2021MotionFiled Stipulation of Dismissal. (SC)21-12668
05/19/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and cause appearing, "this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC)21-14353