Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81752
Short Caption:SALAZAR (DIEGO) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):68403
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C289431Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/28/2021How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/09/2020Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
09/09/2020Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)20-33133
09/09/2020MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Petition for Mandamus in Excess of Type Volume Limitation. (SC)20-33135
09/09/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (SC)20-33141
09/09/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (SC)20-33142
09/09/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3. (SC)20-33143
09/09/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4. (SC)20-33144
09/09/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5. (SC)20-33145
09/09/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6. (SC)20-33146
09/09/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 7. (SC)20-33147
10/02/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Real party in interest's answer due: 28 days. fn1 [Good cause appearing, we also grant petitioner's motion to exceed word length. NRAP 32(a)(7)(D). In the interest of fairness real parties in interest may likewise file an answer not to exceed 7,960 words-the length of petitioner's petition. (SC)20-36302
10/29/2020Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)20-39712
11/04/2020MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion and Stipulation to Stay Briefing Schedule Pending Negotiations. (SC)20-40242
11/05/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Petitioner has filed a motion to stay the briefing schedule on the ground that the parties are engaged in a potential resolution of the dispute. The motion is granted. Petitioner shall have until December 21, 2020, to file either a motion or stipulation to dismiss the petition or the reply to the answer. (SC)20-40407
12/21/2020Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply to Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)20-46123
04/28/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)21-12114
04/28/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition. "ORDER the petition GRANTED AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF MANDAMUS instructing the district court to conduct an evidentiary hearing consistent with this order." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-12115
04/28/2021WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and two copies of writ and two copies of order mailed to Attorney Nadia Hojjat for service upon Chief Judge and Hon. Cristina D. Silva, District Judge. (SC)21-12140
05/11/2021WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Chief Judgeof the Eighth District Court and Judge Cristina D. Silva on May 5th, 2021. (SC)21-13548
05/26/2021RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC).21-15044
05/26/2021Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).