Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81754
Short Caption:DEMPSEY (HENRY) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):81754-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR131564Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/01/2021How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/09/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
09/09/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-33184
09/22/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/21/2018 To Court Reporter: Judy Schonlau (SC)20-34813
09/28/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Criminal Docketing Statement. (SC)20-35486
01/08/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: January 21, 2021. (SC)21-00504
01/21/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)21-01727
01/21/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1. (SC)21-01729
01/21/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2. (SC)21-01730
01/21/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Amended Opening Brief. (SC)21-01731
02/22/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Marilee Cate. (SC)21-05197
02/22/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-05198
02/22/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Transmit Presentence Investigation Report. (SC)21-05200
02/28/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of No Reply Brief. (SC)21-05861
03/01/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)
03/02/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Presentence Investigation Report. Due: 14 days. (SC)21-06039
03/08/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. (SEALED) Presentence Investigation Report. (SC)
03/19/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).21-08029
03/19/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
06/17/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)
07/12/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
07/12/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-19936
07/12/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 19, 2021. (SC)21-19936