Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81787
Short Caption:SOLINGER VS. SCHNEIDER ESQ.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D582245Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/14/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
09/14/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SEALED) (SC)
09/14/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-33755
09/14/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Bruce I. Shapiro. Check no. 12214. (SC)
09/14/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Exemption from Settlement Program/File Documents. Docketing Statement due: 21 days. Transcript request due: 14 days. Opening brief due: 120 days. (SC)20-33759
09/28/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/09/19. To Court Reporter: Rachel Chaisson. (SC)20-35639
10/02/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-36358
10/08/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/09/19. (SC)20-36954
10/16/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Caption. The parties and attorney Louis Schneider shall have 7 days from the date of this order to inform this court who the correct respondent to this appeal is. (SC)20-38184
10/22/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Attorney Louis C. Schneider's response due: November 6, 2020. (SC)20-38786
10/23/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice Regarding Caption.(SC)20-38935
11/06/2020MotionFiled Response to Order Regarding Caption (Louis C. Schneider). (SC)20-40730
11/16/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Modifying Caption and Order to Show Cause. The clerk of this court shall modify the caption of this matter consistent with the caption on this order. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Attorney Louis C. Schneider may file any reply within 14 days of service of appellant's response. Briefing is suspended. (SC)20-41698
12/14/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)20-45239
12/30/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Reply to Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 12/31/20). (SC)
12/31/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Reply to Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)20-46994
01/04/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time in Which to File Reply to Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)21-00124
01/04/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Reply to Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)21-00125
01/07/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's motion for an extension of time to file a reply regarding the order to show cause is granted. The reply was filed on January 4, 2021. (SC)21-00402
04/08/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-10115
05/03/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-12535
05/03/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
05/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 4, 2021. (SC)21-12535