Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81792
Short Caption:LINCOLN CTY. WATER DIST. VS. WILSON, P.E.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Lincoln Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CV-0702520Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Venue
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/15/2021How Submitted:On Briefs
Expedited

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/15/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Dylan V. Frehner. Check no. 1539. (SC)
09/15/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-33939
09/15/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)20-33946
09/15/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Notice of Voluntary Disclosure. You are hereby notified that the law firm of Robison, Sharp, Sullivan & Brust previously represented me (Justice Hardesty) in an unrelated matter for which I do not believe disqualification is required. The undersigned makes this disclosure, however, so that any party who believes disqualification is appropriate may file a motion to disqualify pursuant to NRAP 35. (SC)20-33964
09/22/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Exempting from Settlement Program and Directing District Court Clerk to File the Record on Appeal. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. No briefing will be required in this matter unless ordered by this court. (SC)20-34814
10/06/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC)20-36646
10/14/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. The district court clerk's record on appeal due: November 5, 2020. (SC)20-37800
10/29/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 1. (SC)20-39716
10/29/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 2. (SC)20-39718
10/29/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 3. (SC)20-39721
10/29/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 4. (SC)20-39722
10/29/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 5. (SC)20-39726
10/29/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 6. (SC)20-39727
10/29/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 7. (SC)20-39728
10/29/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 8. (SC)20-39730
10/29/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Index for Volumes 1-8. (SC)20-39732
10/29/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Amended Record on Appeal. Volume 1 (SC)20-39733
11/02/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/15/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)21-10909
04/15/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP21-EC/KP/DH (SC)21-10921
05/10/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-13277
05/10/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 8, 2021. (SC)21-13277