Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81802
Short Caption:LEW VS. CATAMOUNT PROPS. 2018, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):81229
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - 19-CV-00615Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/17/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Donald Lew. Money Order no. 0647269930. (SC)
09/17/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-34286
09/17/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)20-34288
09/29/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's (Wells Fargo) Notice of Appearance for Kelly Dove. (SC)20-35679
10/01/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-36041
10/01/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/18/20 and 08/24/20. To Court Reporter: None listed. (SC)20-36044
10/01/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Stay for Parties Without Attorneys. (SC)20-36046
10/07/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent Wells Fargo's response to appellant's motion for stay due: October 22, 2020. (SC)20-36733
10/08/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's (Catamount Properties) Notice of Appearance for Michael K. Wall (SC)20-36921
10/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. The motion for stay is denied without prejudice. (SC)20-36949
10/12/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. (SC)20-37396
10/12/2020Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Response to Appellant's Docketing Statement. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 10/13/2020) (SC)
10/13/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (Response to Docketing Statement) (SC)20-37439
10/19/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Stay for Parties without Attorney's. (SC)20-38228
10/20/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)20-38364
10/21/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent Wells Fargo Bank's motion for an extension of time to file a response to appellant's docketing statement is granted as follows. Wells Fargo shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the response. (SC)20-38576
10/21/2020Docketing StatementFiled Respondents' Response to Docketing Statement. (Wells Fargo Bank). (SC)20-38661
10/23/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Opposition to Appellant's First Amended Motion for Stay. (SC)20-38896
10/27/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent Wells Fargo's response to appellant's motion to stay due: November 9, 2020. (SC)20-39296
11/10/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. District court clerk's record on appeal due: November 30, 2020. (SC)20-41080
11/12/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed an amended motion to stay enforcement of the district court's orders pending resolution of this appeal. Respondent Catamount Properties 2018, LLC opposes the motion. The motion is denied. (SC)20-41385
11/24/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume I. (SC)20-42777
11/24/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume II. (SC)20-42806
11/24/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume III. (SC)20-42808
11/24/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume IV. (SC)20-42810
11/24/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume V. (SC)20-42812
01/21/2021BriefFiled Proper Person Opening Brief. (SC)21-01718
02/09/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent Wells Fargo's Answering Brief due: March 8, 2021. (SC).21-03904
02/11/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent Catamount Properties 2018, LLC's Answering Brief due: March 8, 2021. (SC)21-04148
02/19/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's (Wells Fargo Bank) Notice of Appearance for Andrew M. Jacobs and Gil Kahn. (SC)21-04991
02/25/2021BriefFiled Respondent's (Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s) Answering Brief. (SC)21-05645
03/05/2021BriefFiled Respondents' (Catamount Properties 2018, LLC's) Answering Brief. (SC)21-06553
03/30/2021BriefFiled Proper Person Reply Brief. (SC)21-09197
03/30/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
06/11/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-16900
07/06/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-19202
07/06/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 7, 2021. (SC)21-19202